California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 30, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013