Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1176.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 1018.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 754.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|