LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB686
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB686
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB686
Compare Versions
SB686 Amended June 10, 2014
SB686 Amended June 4, 2014
SB686 Amended May 24, 2013
SB686 Amended May 7, 2013
SB686 Amended April 22, 2013
SB686 Amended April 1, 2013
SB686 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB686 Amended June 10, 2014
SB686 Amended June 4, 2014
SB686 Amended May 24, 2013
SB686 Amended May 7, 2013
SB686 Amended April 22, 2013
SB686 Amended April 1, 2013
SB686 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare