California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB686 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill June 10, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013