|
09/28/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4691.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6232.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1199.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 785.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1 in ED. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).
|
|
|