LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB69
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB69
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB69
Compare Versions
SB69 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB69 Amended August 18, 2014
SB69 Amended June 16, 2014
SB69 Amended May 6, 2014
SB69 Amended April 21, 2014
SB69 Amended September 12, 2013
SB69 Amended May 28, 2013
SB69 Amended May 24, 2013
SB69 Amended May 8, 2013
SB69 Amended April 25, 2013
SB69 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB69 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB69 Amended August 18, 2014
SB69 Amended June 16, 2014
SB69 Amended May 6, 2014
SB69 Amended April 21, 2014
SB69 Amended September 12, 2013
SB69 Amended May 28, 2013
SB69 Amended May 24, 2013
SB69 Amended May 8, 2013
SB69 Amended April 25, 2013
SB69 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare