California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB69 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill September 12, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013