|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 550, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4971.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Set for hearing August 28. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4958.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4888.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6493.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1090.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 750.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|