LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB699
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB699
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB699
Compare Versions
SB699 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB699 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB699 Amended August 22, 2014
SB699 Amended August 18, 2014
SB699 Amended March 25, 2014
SB699 Amended March 12, 2014
SB699 Amended August 7, 2013
SB699 Amended June 19, 2013
SB699 Amended May 8, 2013
SB699 Amended April 4, 2013
SB699 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB699 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB699 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB699 Amended August 22, 2014
SB699 Amended August 18, 2014
SB699 Amended March 25, 2014
SB699 Amended March 12, 2014
SB699 Amended August 7, 2013
SB699 Amended June 19, 2013
SB699 Amended May 8, 2013
SB699 Amended April 4, 2013
SB699 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare