California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014
Bill March 12, 2014
Bill August 7, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013