Assembly
|
01/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 2860.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2795.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1091.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 817.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 565.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|