LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB760
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB760
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB760
Compare Versions
SB760 Amended January 9, 2014
SB760 Amended September 5, 2013
SB760 Amended August 30, 2013
SB760 Amended August 19, 2013
SB760 Amended August 7, 2013
SB760 Amended May 20, 2013
SB760 Amended April 29, 2013
SB760 Amended April 1, 2013
SB760 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB760 Amended January 9, 2014
SB760 Amended September 5, 2013
SB760 Amended August 30, 2013
SB760 Amended August 19, 2013
SB760 Amended August 7, 2013
SB760 Amended May 20, 2013
SB760 Amended April 29, 2013
SB760 Amended April 1, 2013
SB760 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare