LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB760
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB760
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB760
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 22, 2013
Compare
Amended
Bill
January 9, 2014
Compare
Bill
September 5, 2013
Compare
Bill
August 30, 2013
Compare
Bill
August 19, 2013
Compare
Bill
August 7, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 20, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 29, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 1, 2013
Compare