|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4684.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6222.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6128.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2635.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2598.) (January 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 21. Page 1189.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1189.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 663.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 487.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|