California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB761 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill January 17, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill May 24, 2013