LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB761
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB761
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB761
Compare Versions
SB761 Chaptered September 16, 2014
SB761 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB761 Amended August 18, 2014
SB761 Amended August 4, 2014
SB761 Amended July 2, 2014
SB761 Amended June 10, 2014
SB761 Amended January 17, 2014
SB761 Amended January 6, 2014
SB761 Amended May 24, 2013
SB761 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB761 Chaptered September 16, 2014
SB761 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB761 Amended August 18, 2014
SB761 Amended August 4, 2014
SB761 Amended July 2, 2014
SB761 Amended June 10, 2014
SB761 Amended January 17, 2014
SB761 Amended January 6, 2014
SB761 Amended May 24, 2013
SB761 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare