|
03/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2930.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4080.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 4028.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (February 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 14). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1147.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 752.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 640.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O., GOV. & F., and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|