LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB777
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB777
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB777
Compare Versions
SB777 Chaptered March 28, 2014
SB777 Enrolled March 21, 2014
SB777 Amended February 25, 2014
SB777 Amended February 4, 2014
SB777 Amended May 29, 2013
SB777 Amended May 28, 2013
SB777 Amended May 15, 2013
SB777 Amended May 7, 2013
SB777 Amended April 23, 2013
SB777 Amended April 15, 2013
SB777 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB777 Chaptered March 28, 2014
SB777 Enrolled March 21, 2014
SB777 Amended February 25, 2014
SB777 Amended February 4, 2014
SB777 Amended May 29, 2013
SB777 Amended May 28, 2013
SB777 Amended May 15, 2013
SB777 Amended May 7, 2013
SB777 Amended April 23, 2013
SB777 Amended April 15, 2013
SB777 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare