LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB777
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB777
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB777
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 22, 2013
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 21, 2014
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
March 28, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
February 25, 2014
Compare
Bill
February 4, 2014
Compare
Bill
May 29, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 28, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 15, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 7, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 23, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 15, 2013
Compare