|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 474, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2383.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3175.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2948.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 806.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 734.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|