LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB823
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB823
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB823
Compare Versions
SB823 Chaptered October 1, 2013
SB823 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB823 Amended September 6, 2013
SB823 Amended June 13, 2013
SB823 Amended May 23, 2013
SB823 Introduced March 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB823 Chaptered October 1, 2013
SB823 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB823 Amended September 6, 2013
SB823 Amended June 13, 2013
SB823 Amended May 23, 2013
SB823 Introduced March 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare