California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill June 13, 2013
Bill May 23, 2013