|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 861, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4936.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6296.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6155.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 3492.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|