LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB828
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB828
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB828
Compare Versions
SB828 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB828 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB828 Amended August 19, 2014
SB828 Amended August 4, 2014
SB828 Amended May 6, 2014
SB828 Amended April 21, 2014
SB828 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB828 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB828 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB828 Amended August 19, 2014
SB828 Amended August 4, 2014
SB828 Amended May 6, 2014
SB828 Amended April 21, 2014
SB828 Introduced January 6, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare