California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB828 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014