|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5848.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3161.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|