California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB896 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2014

Amended

Bill May 14, 2014
Bill February 18, 2014