LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB896
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB896
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB896
Compare Versions
SB896 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB896 Enrolled August 5, 2014
SB896 Amended May 14, 2014
SB896 Amended February 18, 2014
SB896 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB896 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB896 Enrolled August 5, 2014
SB896 Amended May 14, 2014
SB896 Amended February 18, 2014
SB896 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare