|
09/17/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6231.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5911.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|