California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB898 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 7, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014