LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB898
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB898
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB898
Compare Versions
SB898 Chaptered September 17, 2014
SB898 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB898 Amended August 18, 2014
SB898 Amended August 7, 2014
SB898 Amended June 25, 2014
SB898 Amended May 6, 2014
SB898 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB898 Chaptered September 17, 2014
SB898 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB898 Amended August 18, 2014
SB898 Amended August 7, 2014
SB898 Amended June 25, 2014
SB898 Amended May 6, 2014
SB898 Introduced January 13, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare