07/01/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2013. | |||
07/01/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1487.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 1468.) | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2100.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 2104.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 897.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |