California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB91 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 24, 2013

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2013

Amended

Bill June 18, 2013
Bill June 12, 2013