LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB91
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB91
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB91
Compare Versions
SB91 Chaptered July 1, 2013
SB91 Enrolled June 24, 2013
SB91 Amended June 18, 2013
SB91 Amended June 12, 2013
SB91 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB91 Chaptered July 1, 2013
SB91 Enrolled June 24, 2013
SB91 Amended June 18, 2013
SB91 Amended June 12, 2013
SB91 Introduced January 10, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare