|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 923, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4602.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6122.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6021.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3142.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2927.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|