LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB971
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB971
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB971
Compare Versions
SB971 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB971 Enrolled August 20, 2014
SB971 Amended August 14, 2014
SB971 Amended June 19, 2014
SB971 Amended April 9, 2014
SB971 Amended March 27, 2014
SB971 Introduced February 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB971 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB971 Enrolled August 20, 2014
SB971 Amended August 14, 2014
SB971 Amended June 19, 2014
SB971 Amended April 9, 2014
SB971 Amended March 27, 2014
SB971 Introduced February 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare