California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 14, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014
Bill March 27, 2014