|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 621, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6023.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3465.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3386.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3214.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|