LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB987
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB987
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB987
Compare Versions
SB987 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB987 Enrolled August 18, 2014
SB987 Amended May 12, 2014
SB987 Amended April 3, 2014
SB987 Amended March 24, 2014
SB987 Introduced February 12, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB987 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB987 Enrolled August 18, 2014
SB987 Amended May 12, 2014
SB987 Amended April 3, 2014
SB987 Amended March 24, 2014
SB987 Introduced February 12, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare