California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB987 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill May 12, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014