|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4643.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6156.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6026.) Ordered to third reading. (Corrected August 18.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 7.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3210.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Corrected April 23.) (Corrected August 7.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|