LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB993
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB993
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB993
Compare Versions
SB993 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB993 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB993 Amended August 14, 2014
SB993 Amended July 2, 2014
SB993 Amended April 21, 2014
SB993 Introduced February 12, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB993 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB993 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB993 Amended August 14, 2014
SB993 Amended July 2, 2014
SB993 Amended April 21, 2014
SB993 Introduced February 12, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare