California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 14, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014