Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3593.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|