California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 8, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2014

Amended

Bill May 19, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014