LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR108
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR108
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR108
Compare Versions
SCR108 Chaptered June 16, 2014
SCR108 Enrolled June 13, 2014
SCR108 Amended May 19, 2014
SCR108 Amended May 6, 2014
SCR108 Introduced April 8, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SCR108 Chaptered June 16, 2014
SCR108 Enrolled June 13, 2014
SCR108 Amended May 19, 2014
SCR108 Amended May 6, 2014
SCR108 Introduced April 8, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare