Senate | 07/03/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1603.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2110.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 433.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |