California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR30 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2013

Chaptered

Bill July 3, 2013

Amended

Bill June 20, 2013
Bill June 10, 2013