LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR30
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR30
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR30
Compare Versions
SCR30 Chaptered July 3, 2013
SCR30 Enrolled July 2, 2013
SCR30 Amended June 20, 2013
SCR30 Amended June 10, 2013
SCR30 Introduced April 1, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SCR30 Chaptered July 3, 2013
SCR30 Enrolled July 2, 2013
SCR30 Amended June 20, 2013
SCR30 Amended June 10, 2013
SCR30 Introduced April 1, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare