Senate | 08/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 1847.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2282.) Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected July 18.) | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 1460.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |